+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 016, 4/16/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Act 016, on 4/16/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 422).
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1409), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Takayama.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:45PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1125), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-13.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-14-13 5:30PM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 156).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 781) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPN/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 211) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 9:45AM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN/TEC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor