+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1629), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-20-19 10:45AM in House conference room 423.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 164) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1141) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-05-19.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 144) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Shimabukuro.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor