+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The conference committee deferred the measure.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; Kidani, L. Thielen.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Takumi, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Thielen.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677).
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 557).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Har, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, McDermott, Say, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1761), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1352), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Fukumoto.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:05PM in House conference room 329.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1142) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 181) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 688) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-07-17.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:35PM in conference room 211.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 387) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor