+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
- Re-referred to EEP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 23
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 222) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Inouye, Keohokalole, Kidani, Kim, Moriwaki, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 637) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kidani, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 28) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, JDC.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.