+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 1:00PM in conference room 211.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ENE/GVO/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 520) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom.
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 3:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/GVO/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.