+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 849).
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Nishihara.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Quinlan, Perruso Co-Chairs; Todd, Matsumoto.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-13-21.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 415).
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1710), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1434), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1077) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Tuesday, 03-23-21 10:15AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 221) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 878) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 11) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, WAM.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.