+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS, JDL.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 483) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:20PM in conference room 016.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HSH, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor