+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 144) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 522) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 418) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Slom.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.