+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1275), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 174) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 848) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Wakai.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 9:35AM in conference room 211.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 356) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to JDL, WAM.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor