+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 457) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.