+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- The conference committee deferred the measure.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-19-13 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 3:00PM in conference room 329.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kidani, Kouchi.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
- House conferees appointed: Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Ohno, Fale.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 497).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cachola, McKelvey excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1602) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:15PM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-04-13.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1002) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Nakashima, Takai.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 60) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 817) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-13 10:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 148) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-01-13 1:30PM in conference room 414.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 01-30-13 1:20PM in conference room 414.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor