+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on LAB/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/EDB on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:30AM in House conference room 309.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB/EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1127) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB/EDB.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Hashem, McKelvey, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Ing.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:02PM in House conference room 309.
- Re-referred to EDN, LAB/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, LAB, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 23) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from EDU/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 599) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-03-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EDU/JDL.
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to EDU.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 177) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to EDU.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Riviere.
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 2:46PM in conference room 229.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor