+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor