+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Act 195, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 195, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang, K. Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 108) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 108).
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Luke, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-17 10:20AM in conference room 325.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 10:50AM in conference room 325.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; K. Rhoads.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Luke Co-Chairs; McDermott.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 519).
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Thielen, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1714), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1366) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 31
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 389) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-13-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 915) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-17 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 430) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:10AM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor