+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 136) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 599) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.