+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 17, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1310) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Lamosao voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 177) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 744) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from HHS/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 531) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
- The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HHS/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to HHS/TCA, JDC.
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
- Passed First Reading.