+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HED, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 2).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 133).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 03-05-13.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-01-13.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 530) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-13 11:30AM in conference room 016.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 409) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Ige, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.