+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TEC, JDL/WAM.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 369) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-12-13 1:20PM in conference room 414.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.