+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 165) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 710) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor