+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1076), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-18-15 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 132).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 742) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Slom.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-15 1:00PM in conference room 211.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HWN/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 357) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 1:30PM in conference room 224.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/GVO, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor