+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
- The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
- The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:55PM in conference room 225.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to AEN/GVO/PSM, CPH/WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/GVO/PSM, CPH.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.