+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH/JDC has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDC.
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 338) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/JDC.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA, CPH/JDC.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor