+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 230) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 1:20PM in conference room 224.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.