+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1287) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 35).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-03-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 547) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.