+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 03-21-19.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cachola, Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1372) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Nishimoto.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 133) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 889) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-19 9:40AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/JDC .
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.