+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2).
- Reported from OMH/PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1070), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamashita, McDermott.
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Fale.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/PBS on Wednesday, 03-13-13 11:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to OMH/PBS, FIN, referral sheet 27
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Solomon). Transmitted to House.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 24).
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 02-15-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from PSM/THA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 320) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
- The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in THA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/THA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/THA.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor