+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 7, 2021 in the House:
- Act 205, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 205, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1).
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 107) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 107).
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakashima, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 2:45PM; CR 325.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 2:45PM; CR 325.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808).
- House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Nakashima, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Ward.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Acasio, Fevella.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 457).
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1824), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1437), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1001) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-05-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
- The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-05-21 11:10AM.
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-03-21 11:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 18
- Pass First Reading
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 54).
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 02-23-21.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC .
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor