+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 73, 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Act 073, on 5/20/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 759).
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 05-02-13.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-02-13.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Yamane, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Aquino, Cheape.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 487).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-09-13.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1486) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1150) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamashita.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-13-13 10:30AM in House conference room 309.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 45).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 03-05-13.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-01-13.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 189) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 1:17PM in conference room 224.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor