+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 162, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1264).
On July 3, 2019 in the House:
- Act 162, on 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1264).
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 112) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 112).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-19 2:30PM in conference room 225.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, San Buenaventura, Cullen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen, Keith-Agaran, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-19 2:15PM in conference room 225.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; L. Thielen, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Ihara, Fevella.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, San Buenaventura, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 659).
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2096), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Deferred one day 04-05-19.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd, McDermott.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from LAB/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1502) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ward.
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, McKelvey, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Matsumoto.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/HSH on Friday, 03-15-19 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 127) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1063) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 519) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:50PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/GVO, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.