+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1312) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 03-17-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 33).
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-03-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Kidani, Ruderman.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.