+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Choy, Ward.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514).
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-05-17.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-04-17.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 386).
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Creagan, Har, Ing, McDermott, McKelvey, Thielen, Tupola excused (8). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1550), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
- Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1197) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 147) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 699) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Kidani, Ruderman.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.