+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1351), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Fukumoto.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
- Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1114) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 145) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 837) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-17 1:45PM in conference room 211.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:35PM in conference room 211.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 56) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.