+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/AEN, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.