+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
On January 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 01-28-13 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 01-26-13 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor