+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH/PSM, LBR/WAM.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from CPH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 492) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/PSM, JDL/WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor