+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WLA, CPH.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
- The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL/HTH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-12-15 3:40PM in conference room 414.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/HTH, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor