+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE, CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.