+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 127, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229).
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Act 127, on 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229).
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 904).
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-16-19.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-19.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 734).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2211) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-19 2:15PM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-19.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1521) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-19-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 107) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1176) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 536) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 9:10AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.