+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor