+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TSM/PSM, WAM.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
- The committee on THA deferred the measure.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on THA/PSM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-08-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to THA/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor