+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 2, 2021 in the House:
- Act 160, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1262).
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 160, 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1262).
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1).
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 22) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 22).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Kitagawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 8:45AM; CR 325.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Todd, Matsumoto.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Rhoads, Baker Co-Chairs.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 406).
- Deferred One Day 04-13-21.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1670), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1213) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 22
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 200) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 766) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:16AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/CPN.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/CPN.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, JDC/CPN.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
- Passed First Reading.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor