+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-26-19 11:30AM in conference room 016.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor