+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 63) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor