+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 129) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 709) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-28-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.