+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, CPC, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 125) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 636) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 91) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.