+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 at 2:30pm in conference room 329.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 11:00AM in conference room 329.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 1:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-15 1:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 651).
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Slom.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Choy, Yamashita Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Matsumoto.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 503).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Tupola voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1627) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-09-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ito.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 03-19-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 111) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 648) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Riviere.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kahele, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai, Slom.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 1:30PM in conference room 224.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEA, WAM.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor