+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.