+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 446) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-13 1:30PM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.