+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 124) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 626) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Wakai.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 9:35AM in conference room 211.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 355) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to JDL, WAM.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.