+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2640) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to HTH, CPN.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor